+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substitute/ amended/ Consent
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 3, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
January 27, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Rep. Lawrence, M. S.
Type:
Primary Sponsor