+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 2
Prepared
House Amendment # 3
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
February 1, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor