+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
February 28, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 22, 2017: House/ circled
February 22, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2017: House/ uncircled
February 8, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor