+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 14, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 6, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 3, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 25, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
January 23, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor