+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2015: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2015: House/ circled
February 27, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 27, 2015: House/ uncircled
February 20, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor