+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ 2nd reading
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 23, 2019 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 7, 2020: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 6, 2020: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2020: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 27, 2020: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2020: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor