+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House/ substituted by Rules Committee
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 8
February 11, 2005: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor