+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 9, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
March 9, 2016: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 9, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 8, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 29, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 11, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor