+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ lifted from Rules Comm
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 55
- Absent: 20
February 7, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor