+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2019: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2019: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor