+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2009: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 62
- Absent: 13
January 28, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor