+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 8, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
March 8, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 2, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 8
February 17, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1