+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ filed
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Substituted in Rules Committee
- House/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2016: House/ circled
February 24, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor