+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 14, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2013: House/ floor amendment
February 28, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
February 13, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor