+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 23, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor