+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- House/ motion to reconsider
- House/ motion to reconsider/ passed
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 5, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 15, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 12, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Absent: 11
February 6, 2007: House/ failed
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 9
January 23, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor