+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- House/ held
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 2018: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
February 26, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 16, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 5, 2018: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 4
February 5, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor