+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 25, 2025 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2025 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 14, 2025 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 12, 2025 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 8, 2025 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2025 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2025 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 27, 2025 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ circled
On February 20, 2025 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 18, 2025 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 7, 2025 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 7, 2025 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 6, 2025 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ held
On January 29, 2025 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 28, 2025 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2025 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 21, 2025 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 15, 2025 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor