+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On December 18, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
February 29, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 26, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 25, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
February 25, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
February 24, 2016: Senate/ circled
February 17, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor