+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 15, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
February 5, 2015: Senate/ circled
February 5, 2015: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 5, 2015: Senate/ uncircled
February 4, 2015: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 30, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
January 26, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor