+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substituted/ amended
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 2
Prepared
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 5
February 10, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor