+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 6, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
February 4, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
February 4, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor