+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ floor amendment # 2
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- Bill Substituted by Sponsor in House Rules Comm from # 0 to # 1
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment 2
Passed
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
March 13, 2019: Senate/ floor amendment # 2
March 13, 2019: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 13, 2019: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 7, 2019: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
March 4, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 19, 2019: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor