+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 9, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 13, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 5
February 7, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 4
January 24, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor