+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ lifted from Rules Comm
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2008: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 19
February 19, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 13, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor