+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 3 to # 4
- House/ to Senate
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
March 2, 2018: House/ substituted from # 3 to # 4
February 21, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2018: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 13, 2018: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor