+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2021: House/ uncircled
February 25, 2021: House/ circled
February 24, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor