+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Rules Committee
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Comm with amends
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
- House/ to standing committee
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- Bill Distributed
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Vote
February 24, 2004: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor