+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2015: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor