+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 4
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 4
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor