+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
February 24, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor