+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On December 29, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 17, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 7
February 5, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor