+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
February 10, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor