+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ substituted by Rules
- House/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
February 19, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 14, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor