+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House/ committee return to Rules Committee
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 2, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 27, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On December 5, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 17, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Vote
February 2, 2007: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor