+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ amended
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substituted/ amended
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 9, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 9, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
January 20, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor