+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Vote
February 25, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor