+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On December 29, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2010: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3
February 12, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 63
- Absent: 12
February 5, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor