+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 20, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Passed
Senate Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2009: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
February 20, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 62
- Absent: 13
January 27, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor