+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 2
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to standing committee
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 11, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 5, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 5, 2021: House/ floor amendment # 2
January 29, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 6
January 29, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor