+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 20, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 10, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 3
January 26, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2012: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor