+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (53)
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ uncircled
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House Comm - Not Considered
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2011: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 25, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 18
- Absent: 11
February 18, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
February 3, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 7
January 26, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor