+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor