+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 15, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2017: Senate/ uncircled
March 3, 2017: Senate/ circled
March 3, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
March 2, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 23, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
February 14, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
January 31, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor