+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 29, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On December 28, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 15, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 14, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Amendments (5)
Senate Amendment # 4
Failed
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
Senate Amendment # 5
Passed
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
Senate Amendment # 3
Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2010: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 25, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
February 24, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 12, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 1, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor