+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 24, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 13, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor