+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (11)
March 14, 2019: House/ circled
March 14, 2019: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 6
March 14, 2019: House/ uncircled
March 13, 2019: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
March 13, 2019: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
March 7, 2019: Senate/ uncircled
March 7, 2019: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
March 6, 2019: Senate/ circled
February 28, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 6
February 8, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor