+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ filed
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ floor amendment # Verbal w/modifications
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
March 8, 2017: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2017: Senate/ floor amendment # Verbal w/modifications
March 7, 2017: Senate/ uncircled
March 7, 2017: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
March 7, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 4
March 7, 2017: Senate/ circled
February 27, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2017: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 17, 2017: House/ substituted
February 17, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 6
February 3, 2017: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor