+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ circled
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 20, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2012: Senate/ uncircled
March 8, 2012: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2012: Senate/ circled
March 8, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2012: Senate/ substituted
February 14, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 14, 2012: House/ substituted
January 31, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor