+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
March 9, 2017: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
March 8, 2017: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
March 8, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 4
February 8, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor